EP1530503 - GAS ENRICHMENT MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pakdaman, Abolghassem Pöhlenweg 29 40629 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Cohausz, Helge B., et al Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz, Helge B., et al Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Sozien Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/20] | Cohausz, Helge B. Prof. Dr., et al Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Partner Schumannstrasse 97 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03735644.1 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003EP06452 | Priority number, date | DE2002127818 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10227818 | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000448 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530503 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530503 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
B01F23/23123 (EP,US);
B01F35/7543 (EP,US);
B01F23/231231 (EP,US);
B01F23/232 (EP,US);
B01F23/2331 (EP,US);
B01F23/237612 (EP,US);
B01F25/31421 (EP,US);
B01F2035/98 (EP,US);
B01F2101/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASANREICHERUNGSMODULE | [2005/20] | English: | GAS ENRICHMENT MODULE | [2005/20] | French: | MODULES D'ENRICHISSEMENT EN GAZ | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | FR | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | LU | 18.06.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
FR | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
LU | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
FR | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4674888 (CARLSON RICHARD F [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10,14,18-20 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4735709 (ZIPPERIAN DONALD E [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,14,18-20* column 3, line 59 - column 8, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE29822696U (SPRONKEN ALEXANDER HELENA L [NL]) [X] 1,7,8,10,14,18-20 * page 4 - page 7; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO0181832 (PETRICK & WOLF ENERGIETECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,14,18-20 * page 5, line 27 - page 11, line 22; figure 2 * |