EP1487722 - DEVICE FOR DISPLACING A BULKY LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARL Installations Magasins Gerard Roquet ( IMGR) Route de St. Pons 34360 Saint-Chinian / FR | [2006/05] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states SARL Instellations Magasins Gerard Roquet ( IMGR) Route de St. Pons 34360 Saint-Chinian / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCQUET, Gérard Route de St. Pons F-34360 Saint-Chinian / FR | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet BREV & SUD 55 Avenue Clément Ader 34170 Castelnau-le-Lez / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet BREV&SUD 2460 Avenue Albert Einstein 34000 Montpellier / FR | ||
Former [2004/52] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet BREV&SUD, 2460, Avenue Albert Einstein 34070 Montpellier / FR | Application number, filing date | 03735783.7 | 20.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003FR00886 | Priority number, date | FR20020003603 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203603 | [2004/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080480 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487722 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487722 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G7/04 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B65G7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN EINER SPERRIGEN LAST | [2004/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPLACING A BULKY LOAD | [2004/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE DEPLACEMENT D UNE CHARGE VOLUMINEUSE | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 11.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | CZ | 01.02.2006 | EE | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | IE | 01.02.2006 | IT | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | RO | 01.02.2006 | SI | 01.02.2006 | SK | 01.02.2006 | TR | 01.02.2006 | LU | 20.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | BG | 01.05.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | HU | 02.08.2006 | [2022/08] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CY | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
LU | 20.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
LU | 20.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1162768 (KARL DAHMEN) [A] 1 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 3 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4946294 (YAMADA TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 47 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9410089U (HAME ERICH [DE]) [A] 9,10 * page 11, line 7 - line 14 ** figures 1-12 *; | [A]DE9414888U (JESSEN LAURIDS ANDERSEN [DK]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE9407132U (BOETTCHER MATTHIAS DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 5 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2002012001 (OKURA YUSOKI CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-21 * | by applicant | DE8812558U | US4946294 | EP0473865 | FR2763925 | JP2002120001 |