EP1490627 - VENTILATOR DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS, IN PARTICULAR ONBOARD A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DES GAZ DE PETROLE PRIMAGAZ 4 rue Hérault de Séchelles B P 97 75829 Paris cedex 17 / FR | For all designated states Souslikoff et Cie 2, route de Queyzans 33340 Saint Yzans de Médoc / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DES GAZ DE PETROLE PRIMAGAZ 4 rue Hérault de Séchelles B P 97 75829 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
For all designated states Souslikoff et Cie 2, route de Queyzans 33340 Saint Yzans de Médoc / FR | |||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE DES GAZ DE PETROLE PRIMAGAZ 64, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Souslikoff et Cie 2, route de Queyzans 33340 Saint Yzans de Médoc / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUVIER, Daniel 8, rue du Chemin Vert F-75011 Paris / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Eidelsberg, Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03735785.2 | 21.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003FR00904 | Priority number, date | FR20020003834 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203834 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081124 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490627 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/08, F17C7/02, F17C7/04, F17C9/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F17C7/02 (EP);
F17C7/04 (EP);
F17C9/02 (EP);
F17C2270/0745 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR LPG ABGABE MIT EINEM VENTILATOR, INSBESONDERE AN BORD EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2005/01] | English: | VENTILATOR DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING LIQUEFIED PETROLEUM GAS, IN PARTICULAR ONBOARD A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ DE PETROLE LIQUEFIE A VENTILATEUR NOTAMMENT EMBARQUE SUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 06.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4781491 (CHIBA TATSUHIKO ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 4 - line 15 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 10 * * column 5, line 15 - line 32 * [A] 3-5,8-10; | [X]US5893995 (WATERS STEVE W) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 58 *; | [X]US6029741 (SANO YOSHIHIRO ET AL) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 43 - line 61 * * column 4, line 40 - line 51 *; | [A]GB484237 (LEWIS N. GOOLD & CO) [A] 4,5 * page 2, line 45 - line 56 * |