EP1545381 - Implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | ARRANGEMENT FOR INCREASING THE STRESS RESISTANCE OF IMPLANTS, AND ONE SUCH IMPLANT | ||
[2014/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare Services AG Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | [2010/44] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Nobel Biocare AB (publ) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Jan Rosendalsgatan 12 S-416 80 Göteborg / SE | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
HALL, Jan Stabbegatan 2A S-416 80 Göteborg / SE | Representative(s) | Capré, Didier, et al Nobel Biocare Services AG Intellectual Property Department Postfach 8058 Zürich-Flughafen / CH | [2014/30] |
Former [2014/07] | Axelsson, Stig Torbjörn, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2013/23] | Roman Ekstedt, Måns, et al Nobel Biocare AB P.O. Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Davies, Dominic Jack, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Byström, Kurt Linus, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03736409.8 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003SE01110 | Priority number, date | SE20020002319 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: SE 0202319 | [2005/26] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004010891 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545381 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545381 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61L27/54 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61C8/0015 (US);
A61C8/0013 (EP,US);
A61C8/0022 (US);
A61C8/0092 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Implantat | [2014/09] | English: | Implant | [2014/09] | French: | Implant | [2014/09] |
Former [2005/26] | ANORDNUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES BELASTUNGSWIDERSTANDS VON IMPLANTATEN UND EIN SOLCHES IMPLANTAT | ||
Former [2005/26] | ARRANGEMENT FOR INCREASING THE STRESS RESISTANCE OF IMPLANTS, AND ONE SUCH IMPLANT | ||
Former [2005/26] | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA RESISTANCE A LA CONTRAINTE D'IMPLANTS ET LESDITS IMPLANTS | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2003 | Translation filed | 25.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2003 | BE | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | GR | 20.02.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | IE | 26.06.2015 | LU | 26.06.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.06.2003 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.06.2015 | ||
LU | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.06.2015 | ||
LU | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | PT | 19.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0072775 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0072776 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0072777 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al) | by applicant | WO0072775 |