EP1608967 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF TUMOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDWIN, Daryl T. 1595 Euclid Avenue Berkeley CA 94708 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Hilary 1504 Noe Street San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
HELDENS, Sherry 2454 24th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 04 /
YI, Sothy 3047 Langhorn Drive Fremont CA 94555 / US | [2006/16] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
BALDWIN, Daryl T. 317 Mangels Street San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | ||
02 /
CLARK, Hilary 495 Harkness Avenue San Francisco, CA 94134 / US | |||
03 /
HELDENS, Sherry 2454 24th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | |||
04 /
YI, Sothy P. O. Box 401 Alameda, CA 94501 / US | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03736450.2 | 01.04.2003 | [2005/52] | WO2003US09992 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004096124 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1608967 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, C12P21/06, C12N15/00, C12N5/00, C07H21/04, C07K17/00, C07K16/00, A61K49/00, A61K39/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN | [2005/52] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF TUMOR | [2005/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 04.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO03052119 (INCYTE GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-29* sequence 11 *; | [X] - "Homo sapiens cation-chloride cotransporter 9 mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20030303), Database accession no. AF345197, URL: EBI, XP002387367 [X] 1-29 * abstract * | [X] - "Solute carrier family 12 member 8 (Fragment)", UniProt, (20021001), Database accession no. Q8NFX9, URL: EBI, XP002387368 [X] 1-29 * column A * | [ ] - "Human transporter and ion channel (TRICH)-11 protein.", Geneseq, (20031006), Database accession no. AAO31003, URL: EBI | International search | [X]WO02080842 (ESTETECON AB [SE], et al) | [X] - HEWETT D.R. ET AL., "Identification of a novel solute carrier (SLC12A8) within an area associated with psoriasis", GENBANK, (20020702), Database accession no. AF390442, XP002975782 | [X] - SWANBECK G. ET AL., "DNA encoding human autoimmune disease associated protein PAT1", GENBANK, (20021017), Database accession no. ABX56570, XP002975783 | by applicant | US4816567 | US5731168 | US4676980 | WO9100360 | WO9220373 | EP0003089 | US5739277 | EP0117060 | EP0117058 | EP0616812 | WO9607321 | US4892538 | US5283187 | WO9325673 | WO9106629 | US5539082 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5489677 | US5602240 | US5034506 | WO9839352 | WO9914226 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - CARON ET AL., J. EXP MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195 | - SHOPES, B., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565 | - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - CREIGHTON, The Proteins, W.H. FREEMAN & CO. | - CHOTHIA, J. MOL. BIOL., (1976), vol. 150, page 1 | - GETHING ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 293, pages 620 - 625 | - MANTEI ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, pages 40 - 46 | - THOMAS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 5201 - 5205 | - ANDERSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813 | - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE (LONDON), (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - CHIEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9578 - 9582 | - CHEVRAY; NATHANS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 89, pages 5789 - 5793 |