04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
02.12.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
18.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
28.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
09.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
26.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] |
12.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
24.12.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
24.12.2010 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
15.12.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.12.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.07.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2010 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
30.04.2010 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
30.04.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.01.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.09.2007 |
First examination report |
|
21.07.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
02.02.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
02.02.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
09.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
08.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
31.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
22.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|