EP1530483 - T CELL RECEPTOR CDR3 SEQUENCES AND METHODS FOR DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | For all designated states Opexa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 835 Green Parkway, Suite 150 Houston, TX 77067 / US | [2010/01] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | ||
For all designated states Opexa Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 835 Green Parkway, Suite 150 Houston, TX 77067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jingwu, Z. 2219 Parkview Lane Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Walton, Seán Malcolm Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03736888.3 | 05.06.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003US17873 | Priority number, date | US20020386287P | 05.06.2002 Original published format: US 386287 P | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03104407 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1530483 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530483 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K39/00, C07H21/04 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P5/16 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/20] | A61K39/00, C12Q1/68, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEQUENZEN DES T-ZELLREZEPTORS CDR3 UND NACHWEISVERFAHREN | [2005/20] | English: | T CELL RECEPTOR CDR3 SEQUENCES AND METHODS FOR DETECTION | [2005/20] | French: | SEQUENCES CDR3 DES RECEPTEURS DES LYMPHOCYTES T ET PROCEDES DE DETECTION ASSOCIES | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 05.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2009 | BE | 30.12.2009 | CY | 30.12.2009 | CZ | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | EE | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | RO | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | SI | 30.12.2009 | SK | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | BG | 30.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | ES | 10.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | IE | 05.06.2010 | LU | 05.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 01.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 05.06.2010 | ||
LU | 05.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 05.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 05.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 05.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9115225 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 33, line 35 - page 34, line 7; table 7 * * page 36 - page 39; claims 1-17 *; | [X]WO0050641 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * page 20 - page 22 *; | [X] - KOZOVSKA M ET AL, "T CELL RECOGNITION MOTIFS OF AN IMMUNODOMINANT PEPTIDE OF MYELIN BASIC PROTEIN IN PATIENTS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS: STRUCTURAL REQUIREMENTS AND CLINICAL IMPLICATIONS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, DE, (1998), vol. 28, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1894 - 1901, XP002928182 [X] 1-17 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4141(199806)28:06<1894::AID-IMMU1894>3.0.CO;2-W | International search | [Y] - MARTIN R. ET AL., "A myelin basic protein peptide is recognized by cytotoxic T cells in the context of four HLA-DR types associated with multiple sclerosis", J. EXP. MED., (199101), vol. 173, pages 19 - 24, XP000578296 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.173.1.19 | [Y] - HONG J. ET AL., "A common TCR V-D-J sequence in Vbeta13.1 T cells recognizing an immunodominant peptide of myeline basic protein in multiple sclerosis", J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 3530 - 3538, XP002928174 | [Y] - HONG J. ET AL., "Reactivity and regulatory properties of human anti-idiotypic antibodies induced by T cell regulation", J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 6858 - 6864, XP002984334 |