EP1515895 - MULTILAYERED PLASTIC CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastipak Packaging, Inc. 41605 Ann Arbor Road Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2010/34] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states PLASTIPAK PACKAGING, INC. 9135 General Court Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARR, Richard, C. 1183 Ty Drive Medino, OH 44256 / US | 02 /
SLAT, William, A. 164 North Grand Pointe Brooklyn, MI 49230 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03737186.1 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US19320 | Priority number, date | US20020392006P | 25.06.2002 Original published format: US 392006 P | US20030461623 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: US 461623 | [2005/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004000659 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515895 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,US);
B65D81/266 (EP,US);
B29B11/08 (EP,US);
B29B11/10 (EP,US);
B29B11/14 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/073 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0777 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0819 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3028 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3042 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/086 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29K2055/02 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/006 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2081/06 (EP,US);
B29K2105/258 (EP,US);
B29K2105/26 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
B32B2272/00 (EP,US);
B32B2305/70 (EP,US);
B32B2307/74 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [2005/12] | English: | MULTILAYERED PLASTIC CONTAINER | [2005/12] | French: | CONTENANT EN PLASTIQUE MULTICOUCHES | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/23] | 25.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5952066 (SCHMIDT STEVEN L [US], et al); | [Y]US6346308 (CAHILL PAUL J [US], et al); | [X]US6365247 (CAHILL PAUL J [US], et al) | Examination | US5464106 |