EP1551522 - PURIFICATION OF N,N-DIMETHYLACETAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd. P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT INC. 675 McDonnell Blvd, P.O. Box 5840 St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENTILCORE, Michael, J. 2358 Pheasant Run Drive Maryland Heights, MO 63043 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03737193.7 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US19405 | Priority number, date | US20020186764 | 01.07.2002 Original published format: US 186764 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004002926 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551522 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551522 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/14, B01D3/42, C07C233/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C07C231/24 (EP,US);
B01D3/146 (EP,US);
Y10S203/09 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/24, C07C233/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNG VON N,N-DIMETHYLACETAMID | [2005/28] | English: | PURIFICATION OF N,N-DIMETHYLACETAMIDE | [2005/28] | French: | PURIFICATION DE N,N-DIMETHYLACETAMIDE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.01.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 20.02.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.2009 | BE | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | RO | 01.04.2009 | SI | 01.04.2009 | SK | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | LU | 18.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | HU | 02.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 18.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
HU | 02.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
LU | 18.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 01.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR1549711 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY) [DX] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US3687820 (AKELL ROBERT B, et al) [X] 1-27* the whole document * | International search | [A]US3959371 (GAVLIN GILBERT, et al); | [Y]US5124004 (GRETHLEIN HANS E [US], et al); | [Y]US5180474 (SKATULLA LUZIAN [DE], et al); | [Y]US6159344 (MARION MARIE-CLAIRE [FR], et al) |