EP1472400 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WETTING A RUNNING FILAMENT STRAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STREBE, Matthias Holbeinstrasse 14 24539 Neumünster / DE | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Rössler, Matthias KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser, Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03737295.0 | 30.01.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003EP00941 | Priority number, date | DE2002105005 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205005 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03066950 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1472400 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472400 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D06B1/00, B06B1/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
D06B1/02 (EP,US);
B05B12/08 (EP,US);
B05B12/16 (US);
B05B12/32 (EP,US);
B05B14/00 (EP,US);
B05B16/95 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2008/39] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BENETZEN EINES LAUFENDEN FILAMENTBÜNDELS | [2004/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WETTING A RUNNING FILAMENT STRAND | [2004/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'HUMIDIFICATION D'UN FAISCEAU DE FILAMENTS CONTINU | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0344649 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2479290 (CILANDER AG [CH]) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4783977 (GILPATRICK MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0965673 (SUPERBA SA [FR]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * |