EP1474021 - COFFEE AND TEA DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Patent Department, One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY Patent Department, One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Patent Department, One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Charles, Bradley 1077 Cedar Oak Court Lawrenceville, GA 30043 / US | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03737587.0 | 03.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003US03075 | Priority number, date | US20020071643 | 07.02.2002 Original published format: US 71643 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03065859 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1474021 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474021 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A47J31/3642 (EP,US);
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
B65D85/8043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAFFEE UND TEE VERTEILER | [2004/46] | English: | COFFEE AND TEA DISPENSER | [2004/46] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE CAFE ET DE THE | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 30.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | LU | 03.02.2007 | IE | 05.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CY | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
LU | 03.02.2007 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2968560 (NATHAN GOROS) [X] 1-5,44-46 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2617389 (DESALTERA [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,44-46 * the whole document * [A] 6-10,47-51; | [X]US5472719 (FAVRE ERIC [CH]) [X] 1-5,44-46 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001052294 (SCHMED ARTHUR [CH]) [X] 1-5* the whole document * |