EP1521949 - METHOD FOR MONITORING A MEASURING INSTRUMENT, IN PARTICULAR A FLOW METER AND A MEASURING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUHL, Frank Ulmenstrasse 53 37124 Rosdorf / DE | 02 /
HERWIG, Jörg Waldeckstrasse 52 79400 Kandern / DE | 03 /
PAPENBROCK, Axel Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 1 37079 Göttingen / DE | 04 /
RIEGLER, Peter In der Russbreite 28 37077 Göttingen / DE | 05 /
ROSSBERG, Axel Yokohama National University,79-7 Tokiwadai Hodogaya-Ku, Yokohama 240-8501 / JP | 06 /
TIMMER, Jens Dreikoenigstr.44 79102 Freiburg / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
BUHL, Frank Ulmenstrasse 53 37124 Rosdorf / DE | ||
02 /
HERWIG, Jörg Waldeckstrasse 52 79400 Kandern / DE | |||
03 /
PAPENBROCK, Axel Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 1 37079 Göttingen / DE | |||
04 /
RIEGLER, Peter In der Russbreite 28 37077 Göttingen / DE | |||
05 /
ROSSBERG, Axel Hinterkirchstrasse 6 79108 Freiburg / DE | |||
06 /
TIMMER, Jens Konviktstrasse 10 79098 Freiburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
BUHL, Frank Schildweg 38 37085 Göttingen / DE | ||
02 /
HERWIG, Jörg Waldeckstrasse 52 79400 Kandern / DE | |||
03 /
PAPENBROCK, Axel Agnes-von-Plesse-Hof 1 37079 Göttingen / DE | |||
04 /
RIEGLER, Peter In der Russbreite 28 37077 Göttingen / DE | |||
05 /
ROSSBERG, Axel Hinterkirchstrasse 6 79108 Freiburg / DE | |||
06 /
TIMMER, Jens Konviktstrasse 10 79098 Freiburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Karl Michael ABB Patent GmbH Oberhausener Strasse 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Schmidt, Karl Michael ABB Patent GmbH Oberhausener Str. 33 40472 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03738046.6 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003EP06367 | Priority number, date | DE2002130607 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10230607 | [2005/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004006199 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1521949 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F25/00 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER DURCHFLUSSMESSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/15] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING A MEASURING INSTRUMENT, IN PARTICULAR A FLOW METER AND A MEASURING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD. | [2005/15] | French: | PROCEDE POUR SURVEILLER UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, NOTAMMENT UN DEBITMETRE, ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE CORRESPONDANT | [2005/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5307667 (CARON RICHARD W [US]) [X] 1,2,5-14 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 3; figure 1 * |