EP1540209 - A SEAL STRUCTURE FOR SEALING THE INLET/EXIT PASSAGEWAY OF AN ELONGATED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JRT Pipe Machinery Ltd Kruunantie 30 65230 Vaasa / FI | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHTINEN, Reijo Rantakatu 51 A 36 FIN-92101 Raahe / FI | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Haimelin, Jukka Ilmari, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Haimelin, Jukka Ilmari, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03738154.8 | 09.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003FI00556 | Priority number, date | FI20020001414 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: FI 20021414 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004011828 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540209 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP,US);
F16J15/32 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | LT | 31.01.2005 | LV | 31.01.2005 | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSKONSTRUKTION ZUM ABDICHTEN DES EINTRITTS-/AUSTRITTSKANALS EINES LÄNGLICHEN OBJEKTS | [2005/24] | English: | A SEAL STRUCTURE FOR SEALING THE INLET/EXIT PASSAGEWAY OF AN ELONGATED OBJECT | [2005/24] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ETANCHEITE POUR L'ETANCHEIFICATION DE PASSAGE D'ENTREE/SORTIE D'UN OBJET DE FORME ALLONGEE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2003 | Translation filed | 31.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 26.01.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB396061 (BELL TELEPHONE LABOR INC); | [A]US3825271 (BELLASTIO A); | [A]US4043722 (BAKER JOHN E, et al); | [A]EP0040169 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4386996 (LANDGRAF HELMUT [DE], et al) |