EP1520110 - SCREW AND DRIVER THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walker, Eric t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | For all designated states Walker, Gloria t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | For all designated states Walker, Colin Russell t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | For all designated states Walker, Philip David t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | For all designated states Walker, Daniel James t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | [2008/36] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Walker, Eric t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | ||
For all designated states Walker, Gloria t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | |||
For all designated states Walker, Colin Russell t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | |||
For all designated states Walker, Philip David t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | |||
For all designated states Walker, Daniel James t/a Walker Properties, Popular Nurseries, main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Eric, t/a Walker Properties Popular Nurseries, Main Street, Swallownest Sheffield S26 4TZ / GB | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Lunt, Mark George Francis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03738291.8 | 27.06.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003GB02740 | Priority number, date | GB20020015376 | 04.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0215376 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005731 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520110 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520110 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B23/00, B25B15/00 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
B25B15/005 (EP,US);
F16B23/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBE UND SCHRAUBENDREHER DAFÜR | [2005/14] | English: | SCREW AND DRIVER THEREFOR | [2005/14] | French: | VIS ET TOURNEVIS CORRESPONDANTS | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2008 | BE | 03.09.2008 | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | HU | 04.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 03.09.2008 | |
ES | 14.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1491515 (YAMAMOTO BYORA CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-11 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]AT398231B (CVETKOVIC MIRKO [AT]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0071301 (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE], et al) [A] 1-11* Abstract;; figures 1,2 * |