EP1519753 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION OF A THROMBOXANE A2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND A COX-2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.M.R.A. CORPORATION B.V. Zeemansstraat 13 3016 CN Rotterdam / NL | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNNER, Hans, R. Avenue de Belmont 1 CH-1009 Pully VD / CH | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03738386.6 | 03.07.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003IB02633 | Priority number, date | US20020394268P | 09.07.2002 Original published format: US 394268 P | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004004776 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519753 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61P9/10, A61P19/02, A61K31/42, A61K31/415 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/42, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON EINEM THROMBOXAN-A2-REZEPTOR ANTAGONIST UND EINEM CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 HEMMER | [2005/14] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION OF A THROMBOXANE A2 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND A COX-2 INHIBITOR | [2005/14] | French: | COMBINAISON PHARMACEUTIQUE D'UN ANTAGONISTE DU RECEPTEUR DE LA THROMBOXANE A2 ET D'UN INHIBITEUR DU COX-2 | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.06.2008 | 07.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/36] | 24.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 24.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0187343 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-29 * page 3, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 14 - line 15 * * page 4, line 22 - line 24 ** page 16, line 15 - line 18; examples 1-7 * |