EP1518344 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTING A LINK PARAMETER ACCORDING TO THE CHANNEL QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/13] | LINK ADAPTATION | ||
[2005/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JELITTO, Jens Saeumerstrasse 11 CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH | 02 /
NOLL BARRETO, Andre R. Gustavo Sampaio 194 ap. 303 CEP-22010-010 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | 03 /
TRUONG, Hong, Linh Rifertstrasse 30b CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
JELITTO, Jens Sawumerstrasse 11 CH-8803 Rueschlikon / CH | ||
02 /
NOLL BARRETO, Andre R. Gustavo Sampaio 194 ap. 303 CEP-22010-010 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | |||
03 /
TRUONG, Hong, Linh Riferstrasse 30b CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | Representative(s) | Klett, Peter Michael c/o IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Postfach 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Klett, Peter Michael IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4 / Postfach 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 03738391.6 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003IB02784 | Priority number, date | EP20020014411 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: EP 02014411 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004004194 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1518344 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518344 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (KR);
H04L1/0007 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/23] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANPASSUNG EINES VERBINDUNGSPARAMETERS ANHAND DER KANALQUALITÄT | [2005/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADAPTING A LINK PARAMETER ACCORDING TO THE CHANNEL QUALITY | [2005/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPARAIL POUR ADAPTER UN PARAMETRE DE LIAISON EN FONCTION DE LA QUALITE DU CANAL | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/13] | FUNKVERBINDUNGANPASSUNG | ||
Former [2005/13] | LINK ADAPTATION | ||
Former [2005/13] | ADAPTATION DE LIAISON | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0225856 (APERTO NETWORKS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 22 *; | [A]EP1054526 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]EP1195936 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] * | [Y] - YU-DONG YAO, "AN EFFECTIVE GO-BACK-N ARQ SCHEME FOR VARIABLE-ERROR-RATE CHANNELS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (1995), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 20 - 23, XP000487372 [Y] 1-12 * page 20, column R, line 8 - line 29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.385946 | [A] - ANNAMALAI A ET AL, "ANALYSIS AND OPTIMIZATION OF ADAPTIVE MULTICOPY TRANSMISSION ARQ PROTOCOLS FOR TIME-VARYING CHANNELS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19981001), vol. 46, no. 10, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 1356 - 1368, XP000791606 [A] 1-12 * page 1356, column R, line L * * page 1357, column L, line 4 - column R, line 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.725313 |