EP1625377 - DIAPHRAGM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANNER ENGINEERING, INC. 1204 Chestnut Avenue Minneapolis, MN 55403 / US | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHRKE, Kenneth, E. 6213 Yucca Lane Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
HEMBREE, Richard, D. 710 Linden Road Bellingham, WA 98229 / US | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/07] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al C/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03738931.9 | 16.05.2003 | [2006/07] | WO2003US15699 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106884 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1625377 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1625377 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/073, F04B53/06, F04B43/067 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
F04B43/067 (EP,US);
F04B43/073 (EP,US);
F04B53/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/07] | G01M19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2006/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEMBRANPUMPE | [2006/07] | English: | DIAPHRAGM PUMP | [2006/07] | French: | POMPE A DIAPHRAGME | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 13.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP16174972.6 / EP3096013 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2003 | AT | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | LU | 16.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.05.2003 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.05.2003 | |
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/44] | SE | 29.03.2017 | |
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3107624 (WILLIAMS WILLIAM A) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]US3254845 (SCHLOSSER PAUL W) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6554578 (SIEGEL NORBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 30-50; claim - * * abstract * * column 5, lines 30-60 * | International search | [Y]US4116590 (PRESTWICH JOHN RICHARD); | [Y]US5163820 (KARLINER RUDOLF R [US]); | [A]US5983777 (CASSADAY MICHAEL M [US]) |