EP1516344 - GENERATOR FOR 188RE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lynntech, Inc. Suite 105, 7610 Eastmark Drive College Station, TX 77840 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Lynntech, Inc. Suite 105, 7610 Eastmark Drive College Station, TX 77840 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CISAR, Alan 15603 Juniper Hollow Way Cypress, TX 77433 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Tom 9388 Haney Road Franklin, TX 77856 / US | [2005/12] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Frankland, Nigel Howard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739171.1 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/12] | WO2003US19105 | Priority number, date | US20020175515 | 19.06.2002 Original published format: US 175515 | [2005/45] |
Former [2005/12] | US20020575515 | 19.06.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004000462 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1516344 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G21G4/08 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
G21G4/08 (EP);
B01J41/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENERATOR FÜR 188RE | [2005/12] | English: | GENERATOR FOR 188RE | [2005/12] | French: | GENERATEUR POUR SP 188 /SP R | [2005/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 07.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4859431 (G.J. EHRHARDT) [Y] 1-5,8-16,19,20,22-38,44,47-53 * the whole document *; | [A]RU2091878 ; | [A]US4642193 (IIZIMA NORIKO ET AL) [A] 1-5,13-16,19,20,22,23,28,29 * column 2, line 56 - line 57; claims 1-4 * * column 3, line 13 - line 20 * * column 3, line 23 - line 32 *; | [A]US5186913 (F. F. KNAPP) [A] 1,28,47-50 * column 4, line 9 - line 19 *; | [A]GB2067343 (BYK MALLINCKRODT CIL) [A] * claims 1,3 * | [Y] - J. SERRANO, "99Mo sorption by thermally treated hydrotalcites", LANGMUIR, washington, dc, usa, (20000404), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 3355 - 3360, XP002264767 [Y] 1-5,8-16,19,20,22-38,44,47-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la9905259 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 21, Database accession no. 1998-238533, XP002260841 & RU2091878 C 19970927 (AS UZB NUCLEAR PHYS INST) [A] 1,13,19 * abstract * | [A] - MARINO, O. ET AL, "Thermal stability of magnesium, aluminum double hydroxides modified by anionic exchange", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 97:44968 CA, URL: STN, XP002260840 [A] * abstract * |