EP1567237 - REMOTELY CONTROLLED TOY ANIMAL SIMULATING AN OBJECT CHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTEL, INC. 333 Continental Boulevard El Segundo, CA 90245-5012 / US | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGRATH, Tara Mattel, Inc. Law Dept. - M/S M1-1220 Attn.: Ms Joen Rose 333 Continental Boulevard El Segundo, CA 90245-5012 / US | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
MCGRATH, Tara 2923 Manhattan Ave. Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 / US | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerald Christian Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller, Gerald Christian Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Müller, Gerald Christian Hansmann & Vogeser Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739174.5 | 19.06.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003US19111 | Priority number, date | US20020286898 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 286898 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041391 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567237 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63H30/04, A63H13/02, A63H11/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A63H13/02 (EP);
A63H11/00 (EP);
A63H30/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/35] | A63H33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNGESTEUERTES SPIELZEUGTIER MIT SIMULIERTER JAGD NACH EINEM GEGENSTAND | [2005/35] | English: | REMOTELY CONTROLLED TOY ANIMAL SIMULATING AN OBJECT CHASE | [2005/35] | French: | ANIMAL-JOUET TELECOMMANDE SIMULANT UNE CHASSE A UN OBJET | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3858872 (SUMMERFIELD WILLIAM F, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11,12 * abstract *; | [X]US4068401 (SAITOH SHIGERU) [X] 11* abstract *; | [X]US6066026 (BART PHILIP D [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US6066026 ; | [Y]US4767376 |