EP1638638 - Two-way slit valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/13] | TWO-WAY SLIT VALVE | ||
[2009/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Inamed Medical Products Corporation 5540 Ekwill Street Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBELMAN, Owen, Shawn 2214 Sanderling Street Ventura, CA 93003 / US | 02 /
BIRK, Janel 1110 Nightingale Place Oxnard, CA 93036 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03739221.4 | 20.06.2003 | [2006/13] | WO2003US19414 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007231 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638638 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638638 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61M39/26 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
A61F5/003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0036 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zwei- Wege-Schlitzventil | [2009/02] | English: | Two-way slit valve | [2009/02] | French: | Valve à fente à deux voies | [2009/02] |
Former [2006/13] | ZWEI-WEGE-SCHLITZVENTIL | ||
Former [2006/13] | TWO-WAY SLIT VALVE | ||
Former [2006/13] | VALVE A FENTE A DEUX VOIES | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | [2010/24] |
Former [2010/20] | EE | 05.08.2009 | |
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | SI | 05.08.2009 | |
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | SI | 05.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6039748 (SAVAGE GEORGE M [US], et al) |