EP1474307 - LONGITUDINAL ADJUSTER FOR A VEHICLE SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keiper GmbH & Co. Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORBE, Michael Eichendorffweg 47 53359 Rheinbach / DE | 02 /
VOSS, Heinz Carl-Maria-von-Weber-Strasse 47 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739453.3 | 04.02.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003EP01062 | Priority number, date | DE2002106300 | 11.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10206300 | [2004/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068553 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474307 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474307 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/08 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B60N2/0715 (EP,US);
B60N2/0705 (EP,US);
B60N2/0825 (EP,US);
B60N2205/20 (EP,US);
G10L2015/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/28] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÄNGSEINSTELLER FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | [2006/28] | English: | LONGITUDINAL ADJUSTER FOR A VEHICLE SEAT | [2004/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGLAGE LONGITUDINAL POUR SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/46] | LÄNGSEINSTELLER FüR EINEN FAHRZEUGSITZ | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0349918 (STORZ E A KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 17 * * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 39; figures 1,2,4-6 * [A] 3; | [A]US5234189 (MYERS TIMOTHY S [US]) [A] 1,5,6,9 * column A * * column 3, line 9 - line 36; figures 2-7 *; | [AD]EP0842808 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [AD] 1,4,7-9* abstract *; | [A]FR2759330 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 12; figures 1-7; claim 1 * |