EP1364379 - CERAMIC CAPACITOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIWAKE, Hiroki 1588-1-C306, Ohara Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1515 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Atsuo 1-20-40, Kohoku Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1161 / JP | 03 /
KOMATSU, Kazuhiro 3-14-25, Sumiyoshi Chitose-shi, Hokkaido 066-0026 / JP | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Holmes, Miles, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03739654.6 | 05.02.2003 | [2003/48] | WO2003JP01175 | Priority number, date | JP20020034943 | 13.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002034943 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069642 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364379 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/12, C04B35/468 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
H01G4/12 (KR);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/4682 (EP,US);
C04B35/6281 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3239 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3267 (EP,US);
C04B2235/36 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/761 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | KERAMISCHER KONDENSATOR UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2003/48] | English: | CERAMIC CAPACITOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2003/48] | French: | CONDENSATEUR EN CERAMIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1056102 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US6303529 (WADA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3* abstract * |