EP1492629 - MATERIAL MADE FROM A SILICONE RUBBER, PRODUCTION PROCESS, AND APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pause, Barbara Zingster Strasse 19 04207 Leipzig / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 03739674.4 | 21.01.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US01785 | Priority number, date | US20020352007P | 23.01.2002 Original published format: US 352007 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068414 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492629 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492629 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/02, C08L83/04, C08K3/10, C08K5/01, D06M15/643 | [2006/08] | CPC: |
D06M15/643 (EP,US);
C08K3/24 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C09K5/063 (EP,US);
D06M15/693 (EP,US);
D06N3/0056 (EP,US);
D06N3/128 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/24, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/01, C08L83/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2005/01] | B05D3/02, C08L83/04, C08K3/10, C08K5/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS SILIKONKAUTSCHUK HERGESTELLTES MATERIAL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG | [2005/01] | English: | MATERIAL MADE FROM A SILICONE RUBBER, PRODUCTION PROCESS, AND APPLICATION | [2005/01] | French: | MATERIAUX DE CAOUTCHOUC SILICONE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET LEURS APPLICATIONS | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 29.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | IT | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | IE | 21.01.2011 | LU | 21.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | ES | 21.02.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
TR | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
LU | 21.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 21.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6222884 ; | [X]US4111189 (DIZON EDWIN S) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0122779 (FRISBY TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 14 * * page 8, line 24 - page 10, line 10 *; | [X]US2001049427 (ATWOOD ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6* claims 1,19,22 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 10, Database accession no. 1987-069195, XP002361017 & JPS6222884 A 19870131 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4119189 (EHRENREICH LEO C); | [X]US5070223 (COLASANTE DAVID A [US]); | [X]US5290904 (COLVIN DAVID P [US], et al); | [X]US5816493 (PIRKLE FRED L [US]) |