EP1520145 - BAFFLED SURFACE COOLED HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana Canada Corporation 656 Kerr Street Oakville, Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Dana Canada Corporation 656 Kerr Street Oakville Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | ||
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Dana Canada Corporation 656 Kerr Street Oakville, Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Alan 66 Bechtel Dr. Kitchener, Ontario N2P 1S8 / CA | 02 /
MARTIN, Michael c/o Dana Canada Copr.,656 Kerr Street Oakville, Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | 03 /
ABELS, Kenneth, M., A. 3114 Shannon Crescent Oakville, Ontario L6L 6B4 / CA | 04 /
BROWN, Robert, Hance 2291 North Orr Lake Road Site OL, Box 45,RR No. 3 Elmvale, Ontario L0L 1P0 / CA | [2012/13] |
Former [2005/17] | 01 /
WU, Alan 66 Bechtel Dr. Kitchener, Ontario N2P 1S8 / CA | ||
02 /
MARTIN, Michael c/o Dana Canada Copr.,656 Kerr Street Oakville, Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA | |||
03 /
ABELS, Kenneth, M., A. 3114 Shannon Crescent Oakville, Ontario L6L 6B4 / CA | |||
04 /
BROWN, Robert, Hance 2291 North Orr Lake Road, Site OL, Box 45,RR No. 3 Elmvale, Ontario L0L 1P0 / CA | |||
Former [2005/14] | 01 /
WU, Alan 66 Bechtel Dr. Kitchener, Ontario N2P 1S8 / CA | ||
02 /
MARTIN, Michael 802-30 Speers Road Oakville, Ontario L6K 2E4 / CA | |||
03 /
ABELS, Kenneth, M., A. 3114 Shannon Crescent Oakville, Ontario L6L 6B4 / CA | |||
04 /
BROWN, Robert, Hance 2291 North Orr Lake Road, Site OL, Box 45,RR No. 3 Elmvale, Ontario L0L 1P0 / CA | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739923.5 | 03.07.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003CA00996 | Priority number, date | CA20022392610 | 05.07.2002 Original published format: CA 2392610 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005825 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520145 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520145 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/03, F28F3/12 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
F28F13/12 (EP,US);
F28D1/0308 (EP,US);
F28D1/035 (EP,US);
F28F3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, SE [2005/43] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLACHER WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT STROMABLENKVORRICHTUNGEN | [2005/14] | English: | BAFFLED SURFACE COOLED HEAT EXCHANGER | [2005/14] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE REFROIDI PAR SURFACE A CHICANES | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | [2012/49] |
Former [2012/48] | SE | 28.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB259824 (AUGUST JACOBI A G) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US3650310 (CHILDRESS EZRA E) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US4072188 (WILSON EDWARD A, et al) [X] 1,3,11,12,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9423257 (MELANESIA INT TRUST [VU], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03071213 (DANA CANADA CORP [CA], et al) [E] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB259824 | US3650310 | US4072188 | WO9423257 | US6109217 | WO03071213 |