EP1509416 - SPLIT STABILISER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A TOOTHED CONNECTION FOR THE OUTER ROTATING PIECE TO ONE OF THE BOTH STABILISER PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Lemförder Metallwaren AG 49448 Lemförde / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHEL, Klaus Boraustrasse 3 19374 Domsühl / DE | 02 /
BAUSTIAN, Torsten Krudop 4 19089 Crivitz / DE | 03 /
KRÜGER, Winfried Am Bostenberg 8 19089 Crivitz / DE | 04 /
BEETZ, Stefan Lindenstrasse 6 19089 Barnim / DE | 05 /
KLASEN, Christian Hegelstrasse 43 19063 Schwerin / DE | 06 /
PETERS, Jochen Vogelsang 4 19370 Parchim / DE | [2005/09] | Application number, filing date | 03740054.6 | 02.06.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003DE01804 | Priority number, date | DE2002125035 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10225035 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03103999 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509416 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509416 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/055, F16D1/068 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B60G21/0553 (EP,US);
F16D1/068 (KR);
B60G21/055 (KR);
B60G2202/135 (EP,US);
B60G2206/427 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/39] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETEILTER STABILISATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERZAHNTEN ANBINDUNG DES AUSSEREN DREHTEILES AN EINEN DER BEIDEN STABILISATORTEILE | [2005/09] | English: | SPLIT STABILISER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A TOOTHED CONNECTION FOR THE OUTER ROTATING PIECE TO ONE OF THE BOTH STABILISER PIECES | [2005/09] | French: | STABILISATEUR SUBDIVISE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE CONNEXION PAR ENGRENEMENT DE LA PARTIE EXTERIEURE ROTATIVE A L'UNE DES DEUX PARTIES DU STABILISATEUR | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]DE4337769 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [Y] 3 * figure 1A * [A] 1,2; | [YA]DE3737735 (DAIMLER BENZ AG, et al) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 17 - line 19; figure 4 * [A] 1,2; | [A]US5491996 (BAARMAN GOERAN [FI], et al) [A] 4 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE1179124 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,3 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0428439 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 55 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE4229025 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,3 * column 4, line 51 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [A]US5527061 (KARL ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2816126 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [A] 1,3 * column 6, line 26 - column 8, line 25; figures 3,6 *; | [A]EP0061368 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10012915 | DE4229025 | US5700027 |