EP1513834 - SUBSTITUTED THIOPHENES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Hans-Jochen Rüdesheimer Strasse 7 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
HEINELT, Uwe Mosbacher Strasse 54 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | 03 /
HOFMEISTER, Armin Pfaugasse 16 55276 Oppenheim / DE | 04 /
WIRTH, Klaus Robert-Schumann-Ring 104 65830 Kriftel / DE | 05 /
GEKLE, Michael Schiesshausstrasse 11 97072 Würzburg / DE | 06 /
BLEICH, Markus Eufinger Strasse 73 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [2005/11] | Application number, filing date | 03740148.6 | 26.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003EP05465 | Priority number, date | DE2002124892 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10224892 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101984 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513834 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513834 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/12, A61K31/4168, A61P11/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C07D409/12 (EP,KR);
A61K31/4168 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | 04.01.2005 | LT | 04.01.2005 | LV | 04.01.2005 | MK | 04.01.2005 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE THIOPHENE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MEDIKAMENT ODER DIAGNOSTIKUM SOWIE SIE ENTHALTENDES MEDIKAMENT | [2005/11] | English: | SUBSTITUTED THIOPHENES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, THEIR USE AS A MEDICAMENT OR DIAGNOSTIC REAGENT, AND A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING THE SAME | [2005/11] | French: | THIOPHENES SUBSTITUES, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION, UTILISATION EN TANT QUE MEDICAMENT OU AGENT DIAGNOSTIQUE ET MEDICAMENT CONTENANT CES THIOPHENES | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Request for further processing for: | 31.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.01.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3758476 (RIPPEL R, et al) [DA] 1-13* column 1, line 30 - line 46; examples 1,4B,7 * |