EP1530747 - ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDENIA, Thomas Brahmsallee 16 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2005/20] | Application number, filing date | 03740430.8 | 03.07.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003EP07263 | Priority number, date | DE2002136937 | 12.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236937 | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004019145 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530747 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530747 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/04, G08B13/187 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
G05B19/0428 (EP,US);
G05B19/04 (KR);
D06F34/28 (EP,US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,US);
D06F2103/38 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23119 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23137 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT | [2005/20] | English: | ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE | [2005/20] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2007 | CZ | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | EE | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | IE | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | RO | 26.09.2007 | SK | 26.09.2007 | BG | 26.12.2007 | SE | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | PT | 26.02.2008 | HU | 27.03.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
BG | 26.12.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 26.09.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
EE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
IE | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
RO | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SK | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 26.09.2007 | |
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 26.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9533248 (CERBERUS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 1 ** page 7, line 12, paragraph 2 - page 8, line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5546071 (ZDUNICH GORDON L [US]) [X] 1-8,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - line 55 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 21 * * column 7, line 13 - line 41 * * figures 1-4 * |