EP1492680 - SECURITY DOCUMENT WITH MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY 32 avenue Pierre Grenier 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2012/16] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Arjo Wiggins Security SAS 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANCIEN, Sandrine 136, route de la Sure F-38140 La Murette / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François, et al Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Tanty, François, et al Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/46] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | Carré, Claudine Bernadette Arjo Wiggins 117, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 03740563.6 | 03.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003FR01052 | Priority number, date | FR20020004121 | 03.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0204121 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082600 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492680 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492680 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, G07D7/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
B42D25/47 (US);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/24 (US);
B42D2033/20 (EP);
B42D2035/34 (EP);
Y10S428/915 (EP,US);
Y10S428/916 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1405 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT MIT MARKIERUNG | [2005/01] | English: | SECURITY DOCUMENT WITH MARKER | [2005/01] | French: | DOCUMENT DE SECURITE AVEC MARQUEUR | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11155608.0 / EP2335945 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2003 | AT | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | IE | 03.04.2013 | LU | 03.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 31.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4686154 (MEJIA EZEQUIEL [CA]) [A] 24,31* column W *; | [A]GB2324065 (SLATER JAMES HOWARD [GB], et al) [A] 24,31 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5869160 (MASON DANIEL T [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 9, line 51; figures 1-5 * [Y] 29,30; | [YA]FR2793726 (TRANTOUL FRANCOIS [FR]) [Y] 29,30 * page 7, line 1 - page 20, line 5; figures 1-15 * [A] 31 | by applicant | WO9420679 | WO9605522 | US5986550 |