EP1497149 - ROOF RETRACTABLE INTO THE REAR DECK OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles Société de droit français 127, rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Société Européenne de Brevets Automobiles Société de droit français 127, rue Amelot 75011 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUEVEAU, Gérard Amik-Farm F-79140 Le Pin / FR | 02 /
GUILLEZ, Jean-Marc "Les Maisons Blanches" F-79140 Cirières / FR | 03 /
QUEVEAU, Paul "Le Logis de la Chironnière" F-79140 Montravers / FR | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | Geismar, Thierry NOVAGRAAF IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/03] | Geismar, Thierry Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 18 Quai du Point du Jour 92659 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03740630.3 | 16.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003FR01225 | Priority number, date | FR20020005211 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0205211 | [2005/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091054 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497149 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B60J7/146 (EP,US);
B60J7/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT EINEM IM KOFFERRAUM ABLEGBAREN DACH | [2005/03] | English: | ROOF RETRACTABLE INTO THE REAR DECK OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/03] | French: | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE DANS LE COFFRE ARRIERE D'UN VEHICULE | [2010/23] |
Former [2005/03] | TOIT ESCAMOTABLE DANS LE COFFRE ARRIERE D UN VEHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 20.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1193093 (FRANCE DESIGN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6131988 (QUEVEAU GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0764553 (PININFARINA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column W * | by applicant | FR20000014187 | FR20020002154 |