EP1525181 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PHENYLALANINE ENAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCB Pharma, S.A. Allée de La Recherche 60 1070 Brussels / BE | [2007/34] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Celltech R & D Limited 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKEAD, Benjamin Mark Celltech R & D Limited, 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 02 /
TYRRELL, Nicholas David Celltech R & D Limited, 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 03 /
JONES, Stephen Wilfred Celltech R & D Limited, 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | 04 /
BROOKES, Michael Handforth Celltech R & D Limited, 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Lechien, Monique UCB Pharma S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Lechien, Monique UCB Pharma S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Thompson, John Celltech R&D Limited Patent Deparment 208 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3WE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03740817.6 | 16.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003GB03108 | Priority number, date | GB20020016574 | 17.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0216574 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007428 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1525181 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/18, C07C231/02, C07C303/38, C07D213/81, C07D471/04 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,KR,US);
C07C225/20 (KR);
C07D311/96 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Extension states | AL | 17.02.2005 | LT | 17.02.2005 | LV | 17.02.2005 | MK | 17.02.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ENAMIDDERIVATEN VON PHENYLALANIN | [2005/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF PHENYLALANINE ENAMIDE DERIVATIVES | [2005/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE PHENYLALANINE-ENAMIDE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/18] | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0035855 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [A] 1,12,16 * abstract ** page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 5 *; | [A]WO0073260 (CELLTECH CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,9,12,25,27 * examples 1,93,233,236,242,249; claim 1 * * intermediates 2,6 * * page 87, line 4 - line 21 * * page 32, line 14 - page 33, line 10 * * page 34, line 33 - page 35, line 2 *; | [PA]WO02068393 (CELLTECH R&D LTD [GB]) [PA] 1-23 * examples 31,120,208; claim 1 * * intermediate 12 * * page 51, line 13 - line 21 * * page 55, line 11 - line 29 * * page 63, line 18 - line 24 * | by applicant | WO0073260 | WO02068393 |