EP1530433 - SHOE, ADJUSTABLE, TRANSPIRING AND CUSHIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melis, Gilberto Via S. Olimpia, 42 09047 Selargius / IT | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Mocchetti, Ilio G. Via Aldrovandi, 7 20129 Milano / IT | [2005/20] | Application number, filing date | 03741100.6 | 08.07.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003IT00426 | Priority number, date | IT2002CA00006U | 21.08.2002 Original published format: IT CA20020006 U | IT2003MI01314 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: IT MI20031314 | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004017777 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530433 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530433 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/08, A43B13/18 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
A43B13/206 (EP,US);
A43B13/203 (EP,US);
A43B7/081 (EP,US);
A43B7/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | 03.01.2005 | LT | 03.01.2005 | LV | 03.01.2005 | MK | 03.01.2005 | Title | German: | ANPASSBARER, ATMUNGSAKTIVER SCHUH MIT FUSSPOLSTERUNG | [2005/20] | English: | SHOE, ADJUSTABLE, TRANSPIRING AND CUSHIONING | [2005/20] | French: | CHAUSSURE REGLABLE A SYSTEME AMORTISSEUR ET ANTI-TRANSPIRATION | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | FR | 28.02.2007 | IT | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | NL | 28.02.2007 | RO | 28.02.2007 | SI | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | BG | 29.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | LU | 08.07.2007 | IE | 09.07.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
LU | 08.07.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
FR | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
FR | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
NL | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4063371 (BATRA VIJAY) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]SU1077613 (URALSKY POLITEKHN INST [SU]) [A] * figure . *; | [A]GB2240254 (COOK IAN DEREK) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,6 *; | [A]EP0910964 (NOTTINGTON HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * column 3 - column 4; figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]US6282813 (SQUADRONI ONIFARES ELPIDIO [IT]) [A] 1,8-11 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 6; figure - * |