EP1542255 - IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMOTO, Hisakazu c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
OOSHIMA, Tsukasa c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Akiyoshi c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
ENOMOTO, Takashi c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
YOKOTA, Masahiro c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
NISHIMURA, Takashi c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 07 /
UNNO, Hirotaka c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp. 1--1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 08 /
TAKEZAWA, Hiroharu c/o I.P. division, Toshiba Corp 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03741381.2 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP08929 | Priority number, date | JP20020206176 | 15.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002206176 | JP20020242044 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002242044 | JP20020265757 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002265757 | JP20030004410 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003004410 | JP20030012199 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003012199 | JP20030026227 | 03.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003026227 | JP20030141994 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003141994 | JP20030161034 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003161034 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004008471 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542255 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/24, H01J9/26, H01J29/86, H01J31/12, H01J11/02, G09F9/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01J29/86 (EP);
H01J11/48 (KR);
H01J29/90 (EP);
H01J29/92 (EP);
H01J9/261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/44] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEEINRICHTUNG, BILDANZEIGEEINRICHTUNGSHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND HERSTELLUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/24] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE, IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGES ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2005 | Translation filed | 19.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 19.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002100311 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]US5827102 (WATKINS CHARLES M [US], et al); | [A]JP2000200543 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2001229825 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP]WO02089169 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) |