EP1544220 - RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING ULTRAFINE INORGANIC PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2007/02] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 1-5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Norio Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 02 /
IIJIMA, Tomonori Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Toyoharu Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03741439.8 | 17.07.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003JP09064 | Priority number, date | JP20020212862 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002212862 | JP20030053696 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003053696 | [2005/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009659 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1544220 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1544220 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/38, C09D4/00, G02B1/04 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F20/38 (KR);
G02B1/04 (KR);
Y10T428/31533 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/20 (KR,EP);
C09D4/00, C08F228/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/45] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRAFEINE ANORGANISCHE TEILCHEN ENTHALTENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/25] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING ULTRAFINE INORGANIC PARTICLE | [2005/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE CONTENANT DES PARTICULES INORGANIQUES ULTRAFINES | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2005 | Translation filed | 14.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 27.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0730168 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH08179123 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH08295665 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH09132563 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH09124592 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH09309923 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JP2001049148 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD, et al); | [A]JPH10171117 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |