EP1541532 - SEWAGE TREATMENT PROCESS BY ACTIVATED-SLUDGE METHOD COMPRISING LINE ATOMIZING TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C & R Co. 5-32, Ohsawa 1-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | For all designated states Chiba, Kousuke 5-32, Ohsawa 1-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states C & R Co. 5-32, Ohsawa 1-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | ||
For all designated states Chiba, Kousuke 5-32, Ohsawa 1-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Kousuke 5-32, Ohsawa 1-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Klemens Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Schlüterstrasse 37 10629 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Schubert, Klemens, Dr. Neue Promenade 5 10178 Berlin-Mitte / DE | Application number, filing date | 03741490.1 | 18.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP09167 | Priority number, date | JP20020212598 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002212598 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004009500 | Date: | 29.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541532 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/20 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C02F3/20 (EP,US);
C02F3/12 (EP,US);
C02F3/26 (EP,US);
C02F1/36 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F3/286 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABWASSERBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN NACH DER BELEBTSCHLAMM-METHODE MIT LINIENZERSTûUBUNGSBEHANDLUNG | [2005/24] | English: | SEWAGE TREATMENT PROCESS BY ACTIVATED-SLUDGE METHOD COMPRISING LINE ATOMIZING TREATMENT | [2005/24] | French: | PROCESSUS DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX USEES GRACE A UN PROCEDE DE BOUES ACTIVES COMPRENANT UN TRAITEMENT D'ATOMISATION LINEAIRE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2005 | Translation filed | 15.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 29.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04187298 (NISHINIHON JIYOUKASOU KANRI SE, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0652182 (YUUGEN KAISHA OHL HYDRODYNAMIC [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, lines 32-44 *; | [A]WO9801394 (CORDEMANS DE MEULENAER ERIC [BE], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 17 * * page 9, lines 1-4 ** page 8, lines 4-7 *; | [A]US5888403 (HAYASHI YUKIKO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 6, lines 26-30 * * column 6, lines 9-33 * | International search | [XP]JP2003126877 (CHIBA KOSUKE); | [AP]JP2003080289 (ADCHEMCO CORP, et al); | [AP]JP2003053371 (ATAKA CONSTRUCTION & ENG); | [AP]JP2002210488 (ZEN SHINKYU, et al); | [A]US6086766 (YASUI HIDENARI [JP]); | [A]JPH09117790 (ALPHA ENG KK) |