EP1644302 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A FERTILIZER AND FERTILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melspring International B.V. Jansbuitensingel 20 6811 AD Arnhem / NL | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVERS, Maurice, Aloysius, Antonius Binnenstraat 6 NL-6674 BZ Herveld / NL | 02 /
TERLOUW, Anton Schellenkrans 50 NL-6904 PV Zevenaar / NL | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03741656.7 | 27.06.2003 | [2006/15] | WO2003NL00480 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005000770 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1644302 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1644302 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C05G1/00, C05G5/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
C05C9/005 (EP,US);
C05B1/04 (EP,US);
C05C9/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C05B1/04, C05B7/00, C05D1/02, C05F3/00, C05C9/00, C05F11/00 (EP,US);
C05C9/00, C05F11/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNGEMITTELS UND DAS DÜNGEMITTEL | [2006/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A FERTILIZER AND FERTILIZER | [2006/15] | French: | ENGRAIS ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 23.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | RO | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | HU | 23.05.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]SU952831 ; | [A]SU1661180 ; | [A]JPS50142367 ; | [X]DE4206877 (INTEVEP SA [VE]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 27, Database accession no. 1983-703954, XP002270409 & SU952831 A 19820823 (AS BELO PEAT INST) [X] 18-20 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 16, Database accession no. 1992-129890, XP002270410 & SU1661180 A 19910707 (DNEPR CHEM TECHN INST) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 07, Database accession no. 1978-12922A, XP002270411 & JPS50142367 A 19751117 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM MFG) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |