|
24.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.02.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
27.10.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
26.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Refund of fees |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
15.08.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
35 |
|
18.07.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |