17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
26.07.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
17.08.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
13.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.11.2011 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.09.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
25.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
03.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
12.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
09.09.2005 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
22.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
18.02.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|