EP1519757 - SCANNING SUSPENSION COMPRISING A PARTICLE WITH A DIAMETER OF AT LEAST 1 MICROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitair Medisch Centrum Utrecht Heidelberglaan 100 3584 CX Utrecht / NL | For all designated states Universiteit Utrecht Holding B.V. Yalelaan 40 3584 CM Utrecht / NL | [2006/31] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Universitair Medisch Centrum Utrecht Heidelberglaan 100 3584 CX Utrecht / NL | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Utrecht Holding B.V. Jenalaan 18a 3584 CK Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIJSEN, Johannes, Franciscus, Wilhelmus Stauntonstraat 28 NL-3554 EX Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VAN HET SCHIP, Alfred, Dirk Pauwoogweide 39 NL-3437 VW Nieuwegein / NL | 03 /
ZONNENBERG, Bernard, Antoni Fazantenkamp 464 NL-3607 DA Maarssen / NL | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/14] | Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03741661.7 | 02.07.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003NL00485 | Priority number, date | EP20020077626 | 02.07.2002 Original published format: EP 02077626 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004004786 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519757 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519757 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/18, A61P35/00 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
A61K33/24 (EP,US);
A61K51/1282 (US);
A61K49/00 (EP,US);
A61K49/1821 (EP,US);
A61K51/1255 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Title | German: | SCANNING SUSPENSION ENTHALTEND PARTIKELN, DIE EIN DURCHMESSER VON MINDESTENS 1 MICROMETER AUFWEISEN | [2005/14] | English: | SCANNING SUSPENSION COMPRISING A PARTICLE WITH A DIAMETER OF AT LEAST 1 MICROMETER | [2005/14] | French: | SUSPENSION DE BALAYAGE COMPRENANT UNE PARTICULE DONT LE DIAMETRE S'ELEVE A AU MOINS 1 MICROMETRE | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2003 | AT | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4863715 (JACOBSEN TROND [NO], et al) [X] 1-42 * tables I,II,VIII,IX * * column 7, line 14 - line 50 *; | [X]US4985233 (KLAVENESS JO [NO], et al) [X] 1-24,28 * see all examples *; | [X]WO9217214 (RANNEY DAVID F [US]) [X] 1-42 * page 76, line 24 * * page 84, line 13 * * page 85, line 12 * * page 113 - lines 20-28; claims 15,56 *; | [X]US5213788 (RANNEY DAVID F [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-21,28 * example 14 *; | [X]WO9310440 (UNGER EVAN C [US]) [X] 1-42 * page 11, lines 5-8 * * page 16; claim 3 *; | [X]US5512268 (GRINSTAFF MARK W [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * column 7, lines 14-50; examples 1,2,6,7,9-11-14,15,32-36 *; | [X]DE19958586 (AVENTIS RES & TECH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-42 * page 3, lines 34,35 * * page 8, line 5 *; | [X] - WEBB ET AL., "Sonochemically produced fluorocarbon microspheres: a new class of magnetic resonance imaging agent", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (1996), Database accession no. nlm8835962, URL: MEDLINE, XP002231065 [X] 1-10,14-17,21,28 * abstract * | [ ] - WEBB ET AL., "Sonochemically produced fluorocarbon microspheres: a new class of magnetic resonance imaging agent", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (1996), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 675 - 683 [ ] * abstract * |