EP1545819 - COUPLING IN TOOLS FOR CHIP REMOVING MACHINING A TOOL, A CUTTING HEAD AND A HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states SECO TOOLS AB S-737 82 Fagersta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUECHER, Mats Baldersvägen 11 S-761 21 Norrtälje / SE | 02 /
BOMAN, Jonas Steffens väg 15 S-791 47 Falun / SE | 03 /
ERIKSSON, Thomas Ingels väg 19 S-791 52 Falun / SE | 04 /
LUNDEQVIST, Jan-Olov Baldersvägen 16 S-737 43 Fagersta / SE | 05 /
VIRTANEN, Kaj Vitm ragatan 8 S-722 26 Västerås / SE | [2011/34] |
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
BLUECHER, Mats Baldersvägen 11 S-761 21 Norrtälje / SE | ||
02 /
BOMAN, Jonas Steffens väg 15 S-791 47 Falun / SE | |||
03 /
ERIKSSON, Thomas Ingels väg 19 S-791 52 Falun / SE | |||
04 /
LUNDEQVIST, Jan-Olov Baldersvägen 16 S-737 43 Fagersta / SE | |||
05 /
VIRTANEN, Kaj Vitm ragatan 8 S-722 26 Väster s / SE | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/09] |
Former [2014/04] | Lieke, Winfried WSL Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/48] | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 03741737.5 | 27.06.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003SE01165 | Priority number, date | SE20020002029 | 01.07.2002 Original published format: SE 0202029 | SE20020003356 | 14.11.2002 Original published format: SE 0203356 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002662 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545819 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545819 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16, // (B23B51/00, B23C5:22) | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B23B27/10 (EP,US);
B23B27/007 (EP,US);
B23B31/11 (EP,US);
B23B2220/12 (EP,US);
B23B2260/112 (EP,US);
B23B2260/132 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | B23B27/16, // (B23B51/00, B23C5:22) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGEN IN WERKZEUGEN ZUR SPANABHEBENDEN BEARBEITUNG, WERKZEUG, SCHNEIDKOPF UND HALTER | [2005/26] | English: | COUPLING IN TOOLS FOR CHIP REMOVING MACHINING A TOOL, A CUTTING HEAD AND A HOLDER | [2005/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR MACHINE A ENLEVEMENT DE COPEAUX, ET OUTIL, TETE DE COUPE ET MANDRIN ASSOCIES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 25.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2012
06.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2012
06.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2012
06.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL Opponent's representative Frhr.Schenck zu Schweinsberg, Elard, et al, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | 05.10.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/35] | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2014 | Appeal received No. T2356/14 | 02.03.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 04.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2003 | AT | 30.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | GR | 01.03.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | IE | 27.06.2012 | LU | 27.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2017 | [2023/22] |
Former [2022/22] | HU | 27.06.2003 | |
AT | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2017 | ||
Former [2022/21] | HU | 27.06.2003 | |
AT | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | HU | 27.06.2003 | |
AT | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2017 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 27.06.2003 | |
AT | 30.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
LU | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3402547 (HORN P HARTMETALL WERKZEUGFAB [DE]); | [Y]FR2590191 (RECOULES ET FILS SA [FR]); | [Y]US5810518 (WIMAN JOERGEN [SE], et al); | [A]US5863162 (KARLSSON RONNY [SE], et al); | [X]US5888029 (BOIANJIU GIDEON [IL]); | [A]US6146060 (RYDBERG CHRISTER [SE], et al); | [Y]EP1260295 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) |