EP1549640 - 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)AZETIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES AND 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)PYRROLIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES AS EDG RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Weirong 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
HALE, Jeffrey, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
LI, Zhen 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
LYNCH, Christopher, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
MILLS, Sander, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
NEWAY, William, E., III 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2005/27] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc., European Patent Department, Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03741995.9 | 16.06.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US18852 | Priority number, date | US20020389173P | 17.06.2002 Original published format: US 389173 P | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03105771 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549640 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, A61K31/4245, A61P19/08 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/4245 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | C07D413/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 17.01.2005 | LV | 17.01.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)AZETIDIN-3-CARBOXYLATE UND 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)PYRROLIDIN-3-CARBOXYLATE ALS EDG-REZEPTORAGONISTEN | [2005/27] | English: | 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)AZETIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES AND 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)PYRROLIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES AS EDG RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2005/27] | French: | 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)AZETIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES ET 1-((5-ARYL-1,2,4-OXADIAZOL-3-YL)BENZYL)PYRROLIDINE-3-CARBOXYLATES UTILISES EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR EDG | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 20.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4096273 (GUTMAN ARNOLD D) |