EP1558759 - METHOD FOR DETECTING MUTATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES WITHIN A LARGE POPULATION OF WILD-TYPE POLYNUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEVELAND STATE UNIVERSITY 2121 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, OH 44115 / US | [2005/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Baochuan 7362 Stockwood Drive Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
GUO, Baochuan 7362 Stockwood Drive Cleveland, OH 44139-5681 / US | ||
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
GUO, Baochuan 33175 Rockford Drive Solon, OH 44139 / US | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03742374.6 | 01.07.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US20768 | Priority number, date | US20020392251P | 01.07.2002 Original published format: US 392251 P | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004003173 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558759 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34, C07H21/04 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2537/163, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2537/163, C12Q2525/107 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS MUTIERTERPOLYNUKLEOTIDE INNERHALB EINER GROSSEN POPULATION VON WILDTYP-POLYNUKLEOTIDEN | [2005/31] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING MUTATED POLYNUCLEOTIDES WITHIN A LARGE POPULATION OF WILD-TYPE POLYNUCLEOTIDES | [2005/31] | French: | METHODE DETECTION DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES AYANT MUTE DANS UNE VASTE POPULATION DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES DU TYPE SAUVAGE | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | 12.05.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.05.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0111083 (EXACT LAB INC [US]); | [A]WO0222879 (PROMEGA CORP [US]); | [X] - SUN XIYUAN ET AL, "Detection of tumor mutations in the presence of excess amounts of normal DNA", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200202), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 186 - 189, XP002429104 [X] 25,27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0202-186 | [X] - MURDOCK D G ET AL, "The age-related accumulation of a mitochondrial DNA control region mutation in muscle, but not brain, detected by a sensitive PNA-directed PCR clamping based method", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20001101), vol. 28, no. 21, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4350 - 4355, XP002310905 [X] 25,27 * the whole document * | [T] - SUN XIYUAN ET AL, "Detection of mononucleotide repeat sequence alterations in a large background of normal DNA for screening high-frequency microsatellite instability cancers.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 15 JAN 2006, (20060115), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 454 - 459, XP002429105 [T] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-05-0919 | International search | [A]US5843756 (STONE STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]WO9915701 (ONCORMED INC [US], et al); | [A]US6280947 (SHUBER ANTHONY P [US], et al); | [A]US6498012 (LAKEN STEVEN [US]) |