EP1527135 - FLUORINATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERNOHOUS, Jeffrey J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MARX, Ryan E. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
NELSON, James M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
HANLEY, Kenneth J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
KOECHER, Steven D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
EASTIN, Brian C. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
SOKALSKI, John S. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.rer.nat.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03742423.1 | 03.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US20944 | Priority number, date | US20020211096 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: US 211096 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004013225 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527135 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/00, C08F297/02, C09J153/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
C08L23/0869 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F297/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L53/005 (EP,US);
C09J153/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0869, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L53/005, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORIERTE POLYMERE | [2005/18] | English: | FLUORINATED POLYMERS | [2005/18] | French: | POLYMERES FLUORES | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 23.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3252932 (BOLSTAD ARCHIBALD N, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 63 - column 6, line 38 *; | [A]WO0105578 (JESSEN WESLEY CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 39,55 *; | [A]EP0434335 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 19, lines 39-45 *; | [A]US5298532 (ALI MAHFUZA B [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |