EP1485505 - MELTING TEMPERATURE DEPENDENT DNA AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
For all designated states Molloy, Peter Laurence 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLLOY, Peter, Laurence 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | 02 /
CLARK, Susan, Joy 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | 03 /
RAND, Keith 54 Nandi Avenue Frenchs Forest, New South Wales 2086 / AU | [2005/08] |
Former [2004/51] | 01 /
MOLLOY, Peter, Laurence 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | ||
02 /
CLARK, Susan, Joy 41 Bellevue Street Chatswood, New South Wales 2067 / AU | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03742899.2 | 26.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003AU00243 | Priority number, date | AU2002PS00769 | 26.02.2002 Original published format: AU PS076902 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03072809 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485505 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6853 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2527/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2531/113, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2523/125 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6853, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2527/107 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZTEMPERATURABHÄNGIGE DNA-AMPLIFIKATION | [2004/51] | English: | MELTING TEMPERATURE DEPENDENT DNA AMPLIFICATION | [2004/51] | French: | AMPLIFICATION D'ADN D PENDANT DE LA TEMP RATURE DE FUSION | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WANG J ET AL, "Determination of human beta2-adrenergic receptor haplotypes by denaturation selective amplification and subtractive genotyping", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, & 51ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; OCTOBER 12-16, 2001, (200110), vol. 69, no. 4 Supplement, ISSN 0002-9297, page 542, XP008078075 [X] 1-19,28 * the whole document * | [X] - WALSH P S ET AL, "Preferential PCR amplification of alleles: mechanisms and solutions.", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS MAY 1992, (199205), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 1054-9803, pages 241 - 250, XP008078076 [X] 1-19,28 * page 242, column 1; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US5618703 (GELFAND DAVID H [US], et al); | [X] - AUER ET AL., "Selective amplification of RNA utilizing the nucleotide analog dITP and Thermus thermophilus DNA polymerase", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 24, no. 24, pages 5021 - 5025, XP002916438 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.24.5021 | [Y] - WORM ET AL., "In-tube DNA methylation profiling by fluorescence melting curve analysis", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 47, no. 7, pages 1183 - 1189, XP002298308 | Examination | - WARNECKE ET AL, "Detection and measurement of PCR bias in quantitative mehtylation analysis of bisulphite-treated DNA", NUCL. ACID. RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 21, pages 4422 - 4426 |