EP1484429 - SEMICONDUCTOR OR LIQUID CRYSTAL PRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, Ltd 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUIBIRA, A, Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Indus Ltd 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
NATSUHARA, M, Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Indus Ltd 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
NAKATA, H, Itami Works Sumitomo Elec. Indus Ltd 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03743036.0 | 26.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003JP02138 | Priority number, date | JP20020050629 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002050629 | [2004/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03072850 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484429 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/458, H01L21/31, H01L21/3065, H01L21/285 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
C23C16/45521 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4581 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4586 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1303 (KR);
H01L21/68792 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALBLEITERN ODER FLÜSSIGKRISTALLEN | [2004/50] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR OR LIQUID CRYSTAL PRODUCING DEVICE | [2004/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS OU DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2003 | Translation filed | 15.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 17.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0334540 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]EP0628644 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]); | [X]US5462603 (MURAKAMI SEISHI [JP]) |