EP1485181 - SELF-CLEANING FLUID FILTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gordon Construction, Inc. 710-A Akin Lane Espanola, NM 87532 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Gordon Construction, Inc. 710-A Akin Lane Espanola. NM 87532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Robert, R. 2537 Camino Alfredo Santa Fe, NM 87505 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2004/51] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 03743153.3 | 18.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003US04905 | Priority number, date | US20020082626 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: US 82626 | US20020277225 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: US 277225 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03072219 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485181 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485181 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/66, B01D35/26 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
B01D35/02 (EP,US);
B01D29/15 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP,US);
B01D29/661 (EP,US);
B01D29/68 (EP,US);
B01D29/72 (EP,US);
B01D63/06 (EP,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
B01D2313/243 (EP,US);
B01D2313/46 (EP,US);
B01D2313/48 (EP,US);
B01D2313/60 (EP,US);
B01D2321/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
C02F1/52 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
C02F2301/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTREINIGUNGSFLUIDFILTERSYSTEM | [2004/51] | English: | SELF-CLEANING FLUID FILTER SYSTEM | [2004/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILTRE FLUIDIQUE AUTONETTOYANT | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.09.2007 | BE | 12.09.2007 | CH | 12.09.2007 | CY | 12.09.2007 | CZ | 12.09.2007 | DK | 12.09.2007 | EE | 12.09.2007 | FI | 12.09.2007 | LI | 12.09.2007 | NL | 12.09.2007 | SI | 12.09.2007 | SK | 12.09.2007 | TR | 12.09.2007 | BG | 12.12.2007 | SE | 12.12.2007 | DE | 13.12.2007 | GR | 13.12.2007 | ES | 23.12.2007 | PT | 12.02.2008 | IE | 18.02.2008 | LU | 18.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | HU | 13.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
TR | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
LU | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
HU | 13.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
LU | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
HU | 13.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
LU | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
BG | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CY | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SI | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
EE | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
DK | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
DE | 13.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
SE | 12.12.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
NL | 12.09.2007 | ||
SK | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
ES | 23.12.2007 | ||
PT | 12.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
BE | 12.09.2007 | ||
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
GR | 13.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 12.09.2007 | |
CH | 12.09.2007 | ||
FI | 12.09.2007 | ||
LI | 12.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 12.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4169792 (DOVEL WILLIAM L [US]); | [X]US5690824 (STUTH WILLIAM L [US]); | [X]US5910249 (KOPP CLINTON [AU], et al); | [A]GB2354185 (BAKEY MICHAEL TERRANCE [GB]); | [X]US6231764 (WILKINS CHARLES A [US]); | [X]US6283305 (MAEDA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) |