EP1504093 - RNA DETECTION ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 502 South Rosa Road Madison, WI 53719-1256 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Third Wave Technologies, Inc. 502 South Rosa Road Madison, WI 53719-1256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, WuPo 1110 North Westfield Road Madison, WI 53717 / US | 02 /
LYAMICHEV, Victor 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
KAISER, Michael 2901 Shefford Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | 04 /
LYAMICHEVA, Natalie, E. 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | 05 /
ALLAWI, Hatim 33 Oakbridge Drive Madison, WI 53717 / US | 06 /
SCHAEFER, James, J. 4369 Crawford Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | 07 /
NERI, Bruce, N. 5714 Kilkenny Place Madison, WI 53711 / US | 08 /
LUKOWIAK, Andrew, A. 2254 High Ridge Trail Madison, WI 53713 / US | 09 /
ARGUE, Brad T. 1623 Echo Dr. Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | 10 /
BARTHOLOMAY, Christian Tor 1913 Reetz Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 11 /
CHEHAK, LuAnne 4430 Saratoga Dr. Janesville, WI 53546 / US | 12 /
CURTIS, Michelle L. 2740 Nadene Road Cottage Grove, WI 53527 / US | 13 /
EIS, Peggy S. 10769 Calle Mar de Mariposa San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 14 /
HALL, Jeff G. 6305 Dylyn Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | 15 /
IP, Hon S. 6310 Pilgrim Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | 16 /
JI, Lin 306 Eagle Heights, Apt. H Madison, WI 53705 / US | 17 /
KWIATKOWSKI, Jr., Robert W. 506 Azurene Lane Verona, WI 53593 / US | 18 /
OLSON, Sarah M. 2968 Thinnes Street Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US | 19 /
OLSON-MUNOZ, Marilyn C. 5878 Tree Line Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | 20 /
SKRZYPCZYNSKI, Zbigniev 881 Orchid St. Verona, WI 53593 / US | 21 /
TAKOVA, Tsetska Y. 9 Oak Glen Ct. Madison, WI 53717 / US | 22 /
THOMPSON, Lisa C. 6737 Pinelake Dr. Madison, WI 53719 / US | 23 /
VEDVIK, Kevin L. 1302 Monica Lane Madison, WI 53704 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2006/10] | 01 /
MA, WuPo 1110 North Westfield Road Madison, WI 53717 / US | ||
02 /
LYAMICHEV, Victor 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
03 /
KAISER, Michael 2901 Shefford Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
04 /
LYAMICHEVA, Natalie, E. 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
05 /
ALLAWI, Hatim 33 Oakbridge Drive Madison, WI 53717 / US | |||
06 /
SCHAEFER, James, J. 4369 Crawford Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
07 /
NERI, Bruce, N. 5714 Kilkenny Place Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
08 /
LUKOWIAK, Andrew, A. 2254 High Ridge Trail Madison, WI 53713 / US | |||
09 /
Argue, Brad T. 1623 Echo Dr. Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | |||
10 /
Bartholomay, Christian Tor 1913 Reetz Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
11 /
Chehak, LuAnne 4430 Saratoga Dr. Janesville, WI 53546 / US | |||
12 /
Curtis, Michelle L. 2740 Nadene Road Cottage Grove, WI 53527 / US | |||
13 /
Eis, Peggy S. 10769 Calle Mar de Mariposa San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
14 /
Hall, Jeff G. 6305 Dylyn Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
15 /
Ip, Hon S. 6310 Pilgrim Road Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
16 /
Ji, Lin 306 Eagle Heights, Apt. H Madison, WI 53705 / US | |||
17 /
Kwiatkowski, Jr., Robert W. 506 Azurene Lane Verona, WI 53593 / US | |||
18 /
Olson, Sarah M. 2968 Thinnes Street Cross Plains, WI 53528 / US | |||
19 /
Olson-Munoz, Marilyn C. 5878 Tree Line Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
20 /
Skrzypczynski, Zbigniev 881 Orchid St. Verona, WI 53593 / US | |||
21 /
Takova, Tsetska Y. 9 Oak Glen Ct. Madison, WI 53717 / US | |||
22 /
Thompson, Lisa C. 6737 Pinelake Dr. Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
23 /
Vedvik, Kevin L. 1302 Monica Lane Madison, WI 53704 / US | |||
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
MA, WuPo 1110 North Westfield Road Madison, WI 53717 / US | ||
02 /
LYAMICHEV, Victor 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
03 /
KAISER, Michael 2901 Shefford Drive Madison, WI 53719 / US | |||
04 /
LYAMICHEV, Natalie, E. 2523 Carriedale Court Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
05 /
ALLAWI, Hatim, Taysir 33 Oakbridge Drive Madison, WI 53717 / US | |||
06 /
SCHAEFER, James, J. 4369 Crawford Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
07 /
NERI, Bruce, N. 5714 Kilkenny Place Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
08 /
LUKOWIAK, Andrew, A. 2254 High Ridge Trail Madison, WI 53713 / US | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743221.8 | 26.02.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US05613 | Priority number, date | US20020084839 | 26.02.2002 Original published format: US 84839 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03073067 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1504093 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504093 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12P19/34 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
C12N9/1252 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6823 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6827 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2561/109, C12Q2537/162, C12Q2525/161 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6823, C12Q2561/109, C12Q2537/162, C12Q2525/161 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2561/109, C12Q2537/162, C12Q2525/161 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | 10.09.2004 | LT | 10.09.2004 | LV | 10.09.2004 | MK | 10.09.2004 | RO | 10.09.2004 | Title | German: | RNA-NACHWEISENZYME | [2005/06] | English: | RNA DETECTION ENZYMES | [2005/06] | French: | ENZYMES DE DETECTION DE L'ARN | [2010/23] |
Former [2005/06] | ENZYMES DE D TECTION DE L'ARN | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10178894.1 / EP2410049 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.2010 | BE | 17.11.2010 | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | FI | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | SE | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | LU | 26.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
BE | 17.11.2010 | ||
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 17.11.2010 | |
CY | 17.11.2010 | ||
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
FI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SE | 17.11.2010 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0190337 (THIRD WAVE TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - line 18 * * page 10, line 26 - page 55, line 17 * * page 63 - page 173 * * examples 2,3 * * claims 1-23,55-58 * * sequences 2, 69, 104, 128, 238, 558 *; | [A] - UniProt, (19961001), XP002389563 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO0190337 (THIRD WAVE TECH INC [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0190337 |