EP1491320 - PRODUCTION METHOD OF SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET, SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET AND PRODUCTION DEVICE FOR THE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Unitech Co., Ltd. 2-1, Koishikawa 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Idemitsu Unitech Co., Ltd. 2-1, Koishikawa 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAKI, Akira 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Masahiro 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03743589.8 | 04.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP02487 | Priority number, date | JP20020059550 | 05.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002059550 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074255 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491320 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491320 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/88 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/9145 (EP,US);
B29C2043/483 (EP,US);
B29C2043/486 (EP,US);
B29C35/16 (EP,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KUNSTHARZFOLIE, KUNSTHARZFOLIE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER FOLIE | [2005/01] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD OF SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET, SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET AND PRODUCTION DEVICE FOR THE SHEET | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE FEUILLE DE RESINE SYNTHETIQUE, FEUILLE DE RESINE SYNTHETIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | Translation filed | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2003 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
SE | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2431042 (INGERSOLL HENRY G) [A] 1* column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 6; figure . *; | [A]EP0716911 (TAISEI KAKO CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * page 12, line 15 - line 27; figures 2A,2B *; | [X]EP0781644 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 3, line 26 - line 46; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0796716 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,9 * page 4, line 33 - line 55; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0929818 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [Y]EP0838321 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0963832 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) | by applicant | EP0716911 | JPH09136346 | EP0781644 | EP0796716 |