EP1482508 - INFORMATION EDITION DEVICE, INFORMATION EDITION METHOD, INFORMATION EDITION PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | For all designated states SHARP CORPORATION 22-22, Nagaike, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHARP CORPORATION 22-22, Nagaike, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | |||
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHARP CORPORATION 22-22, Nagaike, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | |||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sharp Corporation 22-22, Nagaike, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Yuichi, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
HORI, Yoshihiro, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
OHNO, Ryoji, c/o Sharp Corporation 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
OHISHI, Takeo, c/o Victor Company of Japan, Ltd. 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | 05 /
TADA, Kenichiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0047 / JP | 06 /
TOZAKI, Akihiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0047 / JP | 07 /
HIRAI, Tatsuya, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Systems Develop. Laboratory, 9, Ouzenji, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743603.7 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003JP02509 | Priority number, date | JP20020107158 | 05.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002107158 | [2004/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075276 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482508 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482508 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B27/34 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/00 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/326 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | G11B27/00, G11B27/034, H04N5/76, H04N5/91 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/42] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONS-EDITIEREINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONS-EDITIERVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONS-EDITIERPROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONS-AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2004/49] | English: | INFORMATION EDITION DEVICE, INFORMATION EDITION METHOD, INFORMATION EDITION PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2004/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EDITION D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE D'EDITION D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME D'EDITION D'INFORMATIONS, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2004 | Translation filed | 26.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 28.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JP2001169231 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002033986 (SONY CORP); | [AP]JP2002352566 (KENWOOD CORP); | [A]JPH0993527 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH11284948 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |