EP1482035 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PROTEIN USING GENETICALLY MODIFIED SILKWORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | For all designated states NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF AGROBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES 1-2 Kannondai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | ||
For all designated states National Institute of Agrobiological Sciences 1-2 Kannondai 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAMATSU, Shingo Mizuhoryou 208, 2-33-1, Hasshotori, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-0042 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Takashi Atrait Uchidabashi 1101, 1-7-5, Meiji, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 457-0851 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Katsushige 3469-2, Shikata, Shikatsu-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 481-0004 / JP | 04 /
TAMURA, Toshiki 50-1-1, Hitachinohigashi Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1207 / JP | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03743628.4 | 06.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003JP02675 | Priority number, date | JP20020060374 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002060374 | JP20020268726 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002268726 | [2004/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03074699 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482035 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12P21/02 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (KR);
A01K67/033 (EP,US);
A01K67/0335 (EP,US);
A01K67/04 (EP,US);
C07K14/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/10 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVEM PROTEIN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER GENTECHNISCH MODIFIZIERTEN SEIDENRAUPE | [2004/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PROTEIN USING GENETICALLY MODIFIED SILKWORM | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PROTEINE PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE UTILISANT UN VER A SOIE GENETIQUEMENT MODIFIE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2004 | Translation filed | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XL]JP2001161214 ; | [PX]JP2002306167 ; | [PX]US2002137211 (LIU TIANYAN [CN], et al) [PX] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02086119 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1-41 * the whole document *; | [XL] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001161214 A 20010619 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CORP; HIROSHIMA INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY ORGAN) [XL] 1-41 * L: Unity * | [Y] - TAMURA TOSHIKI ET AL, "Germline transformation of the silkworm Bombyx mori L. using a piggyBac transposon-derived vector", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (200001), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 81 - 84, XP002945821 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/71978 | [Y] - OKANO FUMIYOSHI ET AL, "Production of canine IFN-gamma in silkworm by recombinant baculovirus and characterization of the product", JOURNAL OF INTERFERON AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, (200011), vol. 20, no. 11, ISSN 1079-9907, pages 1015 - 1022, XP001206872 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10799900050198462 | [Y] - JI X-H ET AL, "Effects of rhM-CSF expressed in silkworm on cytokine productions and membrane molecule expressions of human monocytes", ACTA PHARMACOLOGICA SINICA 2000 CHINA, (2000), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0253-9756, pages 797 - 801, XP009050285 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * | [Y] - ISHIHARA KENJI ET AL, "Preparation of recombinant rat interleukin-5 by baculovirus expression system and analysis of its biological activities", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19990812), vol. 1451, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 48 - 58, XP004278023 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4889(99)00090-7 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002306167 A 20021022 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CORP; HIROSHIMA INDUSTRIAL PROMOTION ORGANI) [PX] 1-41 * the whole document * | International search | [Y] - TOSHIKI, T ET AL, "Germline transformation of the silkwrom Bombyx mori L.using a piggyBac transposon-derited vector.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20000118), vol. 18, pages 81 - 84, XP002945821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/71978 | [Y] - KATSUTOSHI YOSHIZATO, "Kumikaetai konchu riyo eno teigen", SANSHI KONCHUKEN SHIRYO, no. 28, pages 93 - 95, XP002975378 | [Y] - YAMAO M. ET AL., "Gene targeting in the silkworm by use of a baculovirus", GENES, (199912), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 511 - 516, XP002945820 | [Y] - ZHOU C.Z. ET AL., "Fine organization of Bombyx mori fibroin heavy chain gene", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, no. 12, pages 2413 - 2419, XP002238586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.12.2413 | [XP] - TOMITA M. ET AL., "Transgenic silkworms produce recombinant human type III procollagen in cocoons", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200301), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 52 - 56, XP002975379 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt771 | by applicant | US6218185 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages 81 - 84 |