EP1581053 - EXPRESSION OF ZETA NEGATIVE AND ZETA POSITIVE NUCLEIC ACIDS USING A DYSTROPHIN GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mirus Bio Corporation 505 S. Rosa Rd. Madison, WI 53719 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Mirus Corporation 505 South Rosa Road Madison, WI 53719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAHAN, Sean, D. P.O. Box 267, 10W Hudson St. Mazomanie WI 53560 / US | 02 /
WOLFF, Jon, A. 1122 University Bay Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | 03 /
SLATTUM, Paul, M. 4306 Keting Terrace Madison, WI 53711 / US | 04 /
HAGSTROM, James, E. 4700 Bergamot Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 05 /
BUDKER, Vladimir, G. 5141 Sunrise Ridge Tr. Middleton, WI 53562 / US | 06 /
DAVID, B. Rozema 5731 Pembroke Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | [2005/47] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
MONAHAN, Sean, D. 5610 Tolman Terrace Madison, WI 53711 / US | ||
02 /
WOLFF, Jon, A. 1122 University Bay Drive Madison, WI 53705 / US | |||
03 /
SLATTUM, Paul, M. 4306 Keting Terrace Madison, WI 53711 / US | |||
04 /
HAGSTROM, James, E. 4700 Bergamot Way Middleton, WI 53562 / US | |||
05 /
BUDKER, Vladimir, G. 5141 Sunrise Ridge Tr. Middleton, WI 53562 / US | |||
06 /
DAVID, B. Rozema 5731 Pembroke Drive Madison, WI 53711 / US | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2005/40] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03743756.3 | 24.01.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US02215 | Priority number, date | US20030339934 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: US 339934 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004062368 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581053 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/04, A61K48/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
A61K48/0016 (EP,US);
A61K48/0041 (EP,US);
A61K48/0075 (EP,US);
A61K48/0083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | A01N43/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | EXPRESSION VON ZETA-NEGATIVEN UND ZETA-POSITIVEN NUKLEINSÄUREN MIT EINEM DYSTROPHIN GEN | [2005/40] | English: | EXPRESSION OF ZETA NEGATIVE AND ZETA POSITIVE NUCLEIC ACIDS USING A DYSTROPHIN GENE | [2005/40] | French: | EXPRESSION D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ZETA NEGATIFS ET ZETA POSITIFS A L'AIDE D'UN GENE DE LA DYSTROPHINE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2003 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/35] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9955379 (MIRUS CORP [US]) [A] * page 29, line 15 - page 30, line 14 * * page 37, line 3 - line 9 * * page 39, line 2 - line 26 * * page 41, line 24 - page 43, line 6 * * page 47, line 18 - page 50, line 11 * * page 50 - page 51; table 1 * * page 51 *; | [A]WO0074635 (MIRUS CORP [US]); | [X]US6177403 (STEDMAN HANSELL H [US]) [X] 1-9,11-20 * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 14 * * column 17, line 40 - column 23, line 4 * * column 28, line 4 - line 63 *; | [A]US2001019723 (MONAHAN SEAN D [US], et al); | [A]US2002137707 (MONAHAN SEAN D [US], et al); | [E]WO2004062694 (MIRUS CORP [US]) [E] 1-20 * page 4, line 14 - page 7, line 27 ** page 9, line 13 - page 15, line 32 *; | [X] - LIU F ET AL, "Transfer of full-length Dmd to the diaphragm muscle of DMD-mdx/mdx mice through systemic administration of plasmid DNA", MOLECULAR THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA,, US, (200107), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 45 - 51, XP002970506 [X] 1-9,11-20 * page 46, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 47, column L, paragraph 2 - page 48, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 50, column R, paragraphs 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0419 | [X] - EDITORS: BERKOW ET AL, THE MERCK MANUAL OF DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY, FIFTEENTH EDITION, RAHWAY, N.J., USA, MERCK SHARP AND DOHME RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (1987), XP002411512 [X] 10 * page 347 - page 348 * | International search | [A]US6177403 (STEDMAN HANSELL H [US]); | [A]US6413942 (FELGNER PHILIP L [US], et al); | [A] - GREELISH ET AL., "Stable restoration of the sarcoglycan complex in dystrophic muscle perfused with histamine and a recombinant adeno-associated viral vector", NATURE MEDICINE, (199904), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 439 - 443, XP002920731 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/7439 | [X] - LIU ET AL., "Transfer of full-length Dmd to the diaphragm muscle of DMD-mdx/mdx mice through systemic administration of plasmid DNA", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (200107), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 45 - 51, XP002970506 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0419 |